Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 595 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3521 Week
» 5259 Month
» 132702 Year
» 1798078 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12077 31/10/1950  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1131/10/1950
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 31/10/1950 to Saltley (21A)
Withdrawn 09/10/1971
Time in Service 20 yrs, 11 mths , 8 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
21A Saltley (New) on 31/10/1950
14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 28/01/1956
17A Derby 4w/e 23/03/1957
21A Saltley 8w/e 05/10/1957
2A Tyseley w/e 03/10/1964
2F Bescot w/e 30/10/1965
2G Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 16/04/1966
6A Chester (MR) w/e 01/10/1966
9A Longsight w/e 03/04/1971
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/05/1971
   Withdrawn on 09/10/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 12077
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Saltley (21A)
   
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
03/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
30/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
16/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G)    
01/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
09/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 12077    

prev prev