Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 23 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4650 Week
» 6388 Month
» 133831 Year
» 1799207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12098 23/02/1952  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1123/02/1952
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 23/02/1952 to Nottingham (16A)
Withdrawn 27/02/1970
Time in Service 18 yrs , 4 dys
Cut Up 01/06/2006
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
16A Nottingham (New) on 23/02/1952
9D Newton Heath w/e 12/11/1966
9A Longsight w/e 06/07/1968
   Withdrawn on 27/02/1970
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 27/02/1971


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
23/02/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 12098
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Nottingham (16A)
   
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
27/02/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as 12098    
27/02/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
01/06/2006 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury    

prev prev