Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12099 22/03/1952  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1122/03/1952
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 22/03/1952 to Nottingham (16A)
Withdrawn 17/07/1971
Time in Service 19 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
16A Nottingham (New) on 22/03/1952
1A Willesden 4w/e 10/08/1957
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 04/10/1958
5B Crewe South w/e 21/01/1961
2B Nuneaton w/e 10/06/1961
2A Rugby w/e 05/05/1962
1E Bletchley w/e 11/01/1969
   Withdrawn on 17/07/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
22/03/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 12099
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Nottingham (16A)
   
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
21/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
11/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
17/07/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 12099    

prev prev