Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1783 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15189 Week
» 68205 Month
» 187732 Year
» 3214585 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
85 |
m/e |
04/1909 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12517 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52517 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
27 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 04/1909 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1958 |
Service Life |
49 yrs , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1909 |
26A |
|
Newton Heath |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
To Crewe Works |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
05/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MEECrewe |
|
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
MEECrewe |
|
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/04/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/03/1959 |
Over and Wharton branch (Badnall Wharf) |
One track of this short branch from Acton Bridge contains the LTS locos. shown as transferred to Spital Bridge (Peterboro') on 6th March 'condemned' in official lists viz. 41928/39/41/5/6/8/50/77/8/81-7/90-3, also ex LNWR 0-8-0s 48945, 49109/13/17/57/80, 49226/330/68. Another LTS loco, is at Badnall Wharf (between Norton Bridge and Standon Bridge) viz. 41936 along with 41078/156/724, 43419/631, 50646/725/57/77/818/31/55/65, 51424/53, 52399/517, 58066/196. |
SLS/195904 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 85 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12517 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52517 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52517 |
|
|
06/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|