Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 312 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2013 Week
» 10128 Month
» 137571 Year
» 1802947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 61 m/e 08/1909
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 12527 y/e 1924
British Railways 52527 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 08/1909
Withdrawal Sat 22/08/1959
Service Life 50 yrs , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1909
23B   Aintree on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 01/04/1950
24B   Rose Grove w/e 14/07/1951
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 17/07/1951
24E   Blackpool Central 4w/e 14/08/1954
26D   Bury 4w/e 17/05/1958
     Withdrawn on 22/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23B Aintree w/e 13/09/1947
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 01/04/1950
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove w/e 14/07/1951
ALLOC 24E Blackpool Central 4w/e 07/08/1954
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 17/05/1958
WDN   on 22/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1909 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 61
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12527    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Aintree (23B)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 52527    
01/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
22/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 52527    
10/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev