Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 887 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18690 Week
» 71706 Month
» 191233 Year
» 3218086 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
633 |
m/e |
09/1909 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12529 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52529 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
27 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 09/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/03/1957 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 6 mths , -1 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
24B |
Rose Grove |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/03/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 633 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12529 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 52529 |
|
|
29/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
02/03/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 52529 |
|
|
11/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|