Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1576 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19379 Week
» 72395 Month
» 191922 Year
» 3218775 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
371 |
m/e |
12/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
10835 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
50835 |
y/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
6 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 12/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/08/1948 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1898 |
25E |
|
Sowerby Bridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
24F |
Fleetwood |
w/e |
19/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 371 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10835 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 50835 but not taken up |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 10835 |
|
|