Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 497 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6676 Week
» 10570 Month
» 110355 Year
» 1775731 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 371 m/e 12/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 10835 y/e 1924
British Railways 50835 y/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 6
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 12/1898
Withdrawal Sat 07/08/1948
Service Life 49 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1898
25E   Sowerby Bridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 07/08/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood w/e 19/07/1947
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 11/10/1947
WDN   w/e 07/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1898 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 371
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10835    
01/01/1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 50835 but not taken up    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
07/08/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 10835    

prev