Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 445 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6624 Week
» 10518 Month
» 110303 Year
» 1775679 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1531 m/e 02/1910
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 10891 y/e 1924
British Railways 50891 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 6
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 02/1910
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/03/1950
Service Life 40 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1910
24C   Lostock Hall 4w/e 22/06/1946
25E   Sowerby Bridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 04/03/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 04/03/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 Mirfield Area February-April 1949: 'Royal Scot's' and rebuilt 'Patriot's' are now working occasionally on the Central Division. They usually appear on the 9 a.m. and 5 p.m. Liverpool (Lime Street)- Newcastle trains, returning on the 1.5 p.m. ex Leeds-Newcastle-Liverpool train and the 8.8 p.m. ex Leeds-Liverpool stopping train. Until recently, the turns appear to have been on Mondays only, when the 9 a.m. ex Liverpool is loaded to thirteen or fourteen bogies, but in the last week or two they have appeared more frequently. The following have so far been noted:-Nos. 46106/23/24/34/35/44/56/64 an 45521/26. Class '8' W.D. locomotives are also becoming prominent, a large number having arrived at Rose Grove and one or two at Millhouse, though these may have moved to Rose Grove within the last few days. Apart from several from the N.E. Area, some have been noted ex Scotland, and two-Nos. 90206 an 90713-ex store on the former G.W. Rly.; the last two having passed through Crewe Works. Most of the remaining ex L. & Y. Class '3' rebuilt 2-4-2T's are now in this area and Nos. 50891, 50909/25 are performing regular duties on local trains. SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1910 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1531
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10891    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50891    
04/03/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 50891    

prev prev