Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 542 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6721 Week
» 10615 Month
» 110400 Year
» 1775776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1537 m/e 03/1910
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 10893 y/e 1924
British Railways 50893 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 6
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 03/1910
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/04/1950
Service Life 40 yrs , 2 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1910
23C   Southport 4w/e 22/06/1946
24D   Lower Darwen on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25E   Sowerby Bridge w/e 11/03/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 29/04/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 11/03/1950
WDN   w/e 29/04/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1910 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1537
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10893    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (23C)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50893    
11/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
29/04/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 50893    

prev prev