Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 441 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6620 Week
» 10514 Month
» 110299 Year
» 1775675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 70 m/e 03/1911
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 10901 y/e 1924
British Railways 50901 y/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 6
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 03/1911
Withdrawal Sat 20/03/1948
Service Life 37 yrs , 20 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1911
20D   Normanton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 20/03/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20D Normanton w/e 07/12/1946
WDN   w/e 20/03/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/04/1948 Horwich Works On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1911 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 70
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10901    
01/01/1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 50901 but not taken up    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Normanton (20D)    
20/03/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 10901    

prev prev