Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 521 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6700 Week
» 10594 Month
» 110379 Year
» 1775755 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 112 m/e 03/1911
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 10903 y/e 1924
British Railways 50903 y/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 6
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 03/1911
Withdrawal Sat 14/02/1948
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1911
20A   Holbeck (MR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
20E   Manningham w/e 10/01/1948
     Withdrawn on 14/02/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20D Normanton w/e 23/11/1946
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC 20E Manningham w/e 10/01/1948
WDN 20E Manningham w/e 14/02/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1911 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 112
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10903    
01/01/1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 50903 but not taken up    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
10/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Manningham (20E)    
14/02/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 10903    

prev prev