Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2238 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20041 Week
» 73057 Month
» 192584 Year
» 3219437 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1536 |
m/e |
03/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
10925 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
50925 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Hughes |
Class |
6 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 03/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/08/1952 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1910 |
25E |
|
Sowerby Bridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
09/08/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/08/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1949 |
Mirfield Area |
February-April 1949: 'Royal Scot's' and rebuilt 'Patriot's' are now working occasionally on the Central Division. They usually appear on the 9 a.m. and 5 p.m. Liverpool (Lime Street)- Newcastle trains, returning on the 1.5 p.m. ex Leeds-Newcastle-Liverpool train and the 8.8 p.m. ex Leeds-Liverpool stopping train. Until recently, the turns appear to have been on Mondays only, when the 9 a.m. ex Liverpool is loaded to thirteen or fourteen bogies, but in the last week or two they have appeared more frequently. The following have so far been noted:-Nos. 46106/23/24/34/35/44/56/64 an 45521/26. Class '8' W.D. locomotives are also becoming prominent, a large number having arrived at Rose Grove and one or two at Millhouse, though these may have moved to Rose Grove within the last few days. Apart from several from the N.E. Area, some have been noted ex Scotland, and two-Nos. 90206 an 90713-ex store on the former G.W. Rly.; the last two having passed through Crewe Works. Most of the remaining ex L. & Y. Class '3' rebuilt 2-4-2T's are now in this area and Nos. 50891, 50909/25 are performing regular duties on local trains. |
SLS/194906 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1536 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10925 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sowerby Bridge (25E) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50925 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50925 |
|
|