Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 489 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6668 Week
» 10562 Month
» 110347 Year
» 1775723 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1536 m/e 03/1910
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 10925 y/e 1924
British Railways 50925 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 6
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 03/1910
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/08/1952
Service Life 42 yrs, 5 mths , 11 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1910
25E   Sowerby Bridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 09/08/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 11/10/1947
WDN   w/e 09/08/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1949 Mirfield Area February-April 1949: 'Royal Scot's' and rebuilt 'Patriot's' are now working occasionally on the Central Division. They usually appear on the 9 a.m. and 5 p.m. Liverpool (Lime Street)- Newcastle trains, returning on the 1.5 p.m. ex Leeds-Newcastle-Liverpool train and the 8.8 p.m. ex Leeds-Liverpool stopping train. Until recently, the turns appear to have been on Mondays only, when the 9 a.m. ex Liverpool is loaded to thirteen or fourteen bogies, but in the last week or two they have appeared more frequently. The following have so far been noted:-Nos. 46106/23/24/34/35/44/56/64 an 45521/26. Class '8' W.D. locomotives are also becoming prominent, a large number having arrived at Rose Grove and one or two at Millhouse, though these may have moved to Rose Grove within the last few days. Apart from several from the N.E. Area, some have been noted ex Scotland, and two-Nos. 90206 an 90713-ex store on the former G.W. Rly.; the last two having passed through Crewe Works. Most of the remaining ex L. & Y. Class '3' rebuilt 2-4-2T's are now in this area and Nos. 50891, 50909/25 are performing regular duties on local trains. SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1910 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1536
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10925    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50925    
09/08/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 50925    

prev prev