Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 442 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6621 Week
» 10515 Month
» 110300 Year
» 1775676 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 719 m/e 12/1910
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 10943 y/e 1924
British Railways 50943 y/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 6
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 12/1910
Withdrawal Sat 18/12/1948
Service Life 38 yrs , 18 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1910
25E   Sowerby Bridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 18/12/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 26/10/1946
EXLOAN 24D Lower Darwen w/e 03/07/1948
WDN   w/e 18/12/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/05/1946 New LMS Districts New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. SLS/194606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1910 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 719
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10943    
01/01/1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 50943 but not taken up    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
18/12/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 10943    

prev prev