Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 514 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6693 Week
» 10587 Month
» 110372 Year
» 1775748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 1543 m/e 04/1910
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 10945 y/e 1924
British Railways 50945 y/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 6
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 04/1910
Withdrawal During 01/1949
Service Life 38 yrs , 9 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1910
23D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 22/06/1946
24D   Lower Darwen on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 18/09/1948
     Withdrawn m/e 01/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 26F Lees (Oldham) m/e 31/01/1946
EXLOAN 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 27/04/1946
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 18/09/1948
WDN   w/e 08/01/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1910 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1543
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10945    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D)    
01/01/1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 50945 but not taken up    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D)    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
01/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 10945    

prev prev