Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 545 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6724 Week
» 10618 Month
» 110403 Year
» 1775779 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 670 m/e 08/1899
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 10951 y/e 1924
British Railways 50951 y/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 6
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 08/1899
Withdrawal During 01/1950
Service Life 50 yrs , 5 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1899
24D   Lower Darwen on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 01/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 27/09/1947
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 13/12/1947
WDN   w/e 21/01/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1899 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 670
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10951    
01/01/1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 50951 but not taken up    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D)    
01/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 10951    

prev prev