Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 529 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6708 Week
» 10602 Month
» 110387 Year
» 1775763 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 120 m/e 10/1898
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 10953 y/e 1924
British Railways 50953 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Hughes
Class 6
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 10/1898
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/04/1950
Service Life 51 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1898
24D   Lower Darwen on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 18/09/1948
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 04/06/1949
25E   Sowerby Bridge w/e 11/03/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 08/04/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 04/06/1949
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 11/03/1950
WDN   w/e 08/04/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/04/1948 Horwich Works On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1898 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 120
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 10953    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50953    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
04/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
11/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
08/04/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 50953    

prev