Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3834 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17240 Week
» 70256 Month
» 189783 Year
» 3216636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
43 |
m/e |
12/1921 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Hurry Riches |
Class |
R |
Company History |
RR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
To Service |
During 12/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 25/02/1957 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys |
Total Mileage |
565,698 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1921 |
RYR |
|
Radyr |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88B |
|
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/02/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
28/02/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 43 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Radyr (RYR) |
|
|
10/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
25/02/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43 |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|