Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 208 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5739 Week
» 30573 Month
» 64905 Year
» 1730281 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 46 m/e 10/1909

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Hurry Riches
Class R
Company History RR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 10/1909
Withdrawal Mon 10/07/1950
Service Life 40 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1909
     Withdrawn on 10/07/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RYR Radyr 4w/e 09/08/1947
WDN RYR Radyr on 10/07/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/10/1950 Swindon Works On the occasion of the visit on 8/10/50, interesting engines were 7925 Westol Hall (83G), 6770, 9429 (RSH.7566/50), 8464 (YEC.2457/50), 7926 (not painted), 7924 Thornycroft Hall; new construction included 7927-7929 an 6771 onwards. The stock shed contained 5 Portishead, 992, 1366/69/71, 2014/7, 2195, 2754, 2894/5, 3453, 3645, 3666, 3866, 4055, 4901/25/56, 5068, 5084, 5086, 5523, 5534, 5700, 5924, 6102/7, 6716, 6915, 6924, 7037 (no name), 7923 Speke Hall; there were two new tanks in the running shed, 8422 an 9428 (RSH.7565/50). On the dump were 46, 281, 294, 422, 428, 1747, 1919, 1949, 1989, 2006, 2022, 2047, 2064, 2716, 2794, 3386, and S. & M. 'Coal Engines' 8108 (8182 & 8236 partly dismantled). It is reported that 8463 (0-6-0T) has no works plate, and that 9427 is RSH. 7564/50, but it may not be generally known that the makers' plates are fixed only to the left side leading splashers on these engines. SLS/195012
18/11/1950 Swindon Works New construction 18/11/50-7820 Dinmore Manor, 7821 (painted), 7822 well forward, 7823-7827 laid down; 6772/4 in shed, 6775 completed and 6776/7 nearly so; 6778/9 laid down: 8466 Y.E. Co. 2459/50, 9432 R.S.H. 7569/50. Being cut up: 2738, 1799, 3168 (?); in the dump 46, 281, 294, 422, 1705/47/89, 1858/70, 1949, 2022/47/64, 2155/89, 2754/60, 3386. SLS/195101

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1909 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 46
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
10/07/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 46    

prev