Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 50 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5581 Week
» 30415 Month
» 64747 Year
» 1730123 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Rhymney Railway 110 m/e 08/1904
Great Western Railway 51 y/e 1923

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Jenkins
Class M
Company History RR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 08/1904
Withdrawal Mon 25/10/1948
Service Life 44 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys
Total Mileage 689,280

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 25/12/1948

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1904
     Withdrawn on 25/10/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN CED Cardiff East Dock on 18/10/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1964 Crewe North MPD (Stored) Ex-Works: D208, D380, D1631/2, 42546, 46491 44803, 70033, 78023; Stored: 45552/4/6, 45617/72/6, 45704, 46228/35/9/40/5/8,51/4/6, 71000. Also on shed: D1585, D1697, D1744, 5056. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1904 To Service To service as Rhymney Railway Number 110
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 51    
25/10/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 51    
25/12/1948 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev