Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 320 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5039 Week
» 16184 Month
» 115969 Year
» 1781345 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 56 m/e 05/1910

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Hurry Riches
Class A
Company History RR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 05/1910
Withdrawal Mon 28/09/1953
Service Life 43 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1910
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 01/11/1952
     Withdrawn on 28/09/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 01/11/1952
WDN   m/e 30/09/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1964 Crewe North MPD (Stored) Ex-Works: D208, D380, D1631/2, 42546, 46491 44803, 70033, 78023; Stored: 45552/4/6, 45617/72/6, 45704, 46228/35/9/40/5/8,51/4/6, 71000. Also on shed: D1585, D1697, D1744, 5056. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1910 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 56
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
28/09/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 56    

prev prev