Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 272 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1180 Week
» 12325 Month
» 112110 Year
» 1777486 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 59 m/e 06/1911

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Hurry Riches
Class A
Company History RR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hudswell Clarke
To Service During 06/1911
Withdrawal Fri 29/07/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys
Total Mileage 722,856

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 10/09/1955 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1911
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/09/1951
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 30/09/1951
88B   Cardiff East Dock 3w/e 17/05/1952
     Withdrawn on 29/07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/05/1952
WDN   m/e 31/07/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1911 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 59
Built at Hudswell Clarke
   
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
29/07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 59    
10/09/1955 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev