Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 295 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5014 Week
» 16159 Month
» 115944 Year
» 1781320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 61 m/e 08/1911

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Hurry Riches
Class A
Company History RR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hudswell Clarke
To Service During 08/1911
Withdrawal Mon 20/02/1950
Service Life 38 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1911
RHY   Rhymney m/e 30/06/1948
CED   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 07/08/1948
     Withdrawn on 20/02/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC CED Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 07/08/1948
WDN 88B Cardiff East Dock m/e 28/02/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1911 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 61
Built at Hudswell Clarke
   
30/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY)    
07/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (CED)    
20/02/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 61    

prev prev