Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1008 Today
» 887 Yesterday
» 6810 Week
» 18047 Month
» 250967 Year
» 1916343 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 73 m/e 07/1910

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Hurry Riches
Class A
Company History RR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
To Service During 07/1910
Withdrawal Fri 11/07/1952
Service Life 42 yrs , 11 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1910
RHY   Rhymney m/e 31/03/1948
CED   Cardiff East Dock m/e 30/06/1948
88A   Cardiff Cathays m/e 31/01/1951
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 28/02/1951
     Withdrawn on 11/07/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney m/e 31/03/1948
ALLOC CED Cardiff East Dock m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays m/e 31/01/1951
WDN   m/e 31/07/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1910 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 73
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
   
31/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY)    
30/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (CED)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
11/07/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 73    

prev prev