Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1735 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15141 Week
» 68157 Month
» 187684 Year
» 3214537 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Swansea Harbour Trust |
5 |
m/e |
04/1905 |
Great Western Railway |
701 |
m/e |
01/1923 |
Great Western Railway (2nd) |
1140 |
on |
25/06/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Swansea Harbour Trust Number 5 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock |
|
|
01/1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 701 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea East Dock (SED) |
|
|
25/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1140 |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
26/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1140 |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|