Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 949 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18752 Week
» 71768 Month
» 191295 Year
» 3218148 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
411 |
m/e |
02/1921 |
Great Western Railway |
401 |
y/e |
1924 |
Great Western Railway |
303 |
on |
21/01/1947 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 02/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/05/1956 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys |
Total Mileage |
751,787 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1921 |
THT |
|
Treherbert |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88C |
|
Barry |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
05/05/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 411 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 401 |
|
|
21/01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 303 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
05/05/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 303 |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|