Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 101 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 6618 Week
» 6618 Month
» 73480 Year
» 1738856 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 411 m/e 02/1921
Great Western Railway 401 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway 303 on 21/01/1947 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 02/1921
Withdrawal Sat 05/05/1956
Service Life 35 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys
Total Mileage 751,787

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 08/09/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1921
88C   Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
     Withdrawn on 05/05/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   m/e 31/05/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1921 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 411
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 401    
21/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 303    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
05/05/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 303    
08/09/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev