Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 22 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 3999 Week
» 15236 Month
» 248156 Year
» 1913532 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 413 m/e 03/1921
Great Western Railway 403 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway 305 on 28/05/1947 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 03/1921
Withdrawal Mon 01/04/1957
Service Life 36 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys
Total Mileage 745,328

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 18/05/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1921
     Withdrawn on 01/04/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   m/e 30/04/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1921 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 413
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 403    
28/05/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 305    
01/04/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 305    
18/05/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev