Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1083 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18886 Week
» 71902 Month
» 191429 Year
» 3218282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
413 |
m/e |
03/1921 |
Great Western Railway |
403 |
y/e |
1924 |
Great Western Railway |
305 |
on |
28/05/1947 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 03/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 01/04/1957 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys |
Total Mileage |
745,328 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1921 |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
01/04/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 413 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 403 |
|
|
28/05/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 305 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
01/04/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 305 |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|