Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 53 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4399 Week
» 4399 Month
» 71261 Year
» 1736637 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 7 m/e 11/1914
Great Western Railway 335 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 11/1914
Withdrawal Thu 18/03/1954
Service Life 39 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys
Total Mileage 739,373

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 17/07/1954 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1914
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 25/11/1953
     Withdrawn on 18/03/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 28/11/1953
WDN   m/e 31/03/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1914 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 7
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 335    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
18/03/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 335    
17/07/1954 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev