Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 455 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5930 Week
» 5930 Month
» 72792 Year
» 1738168 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 20 m/e 05/1920
Great Western Railway 345 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 05/1920
Withdrawal Thu 22/09/1955
Service Life 35 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys
Total Mileage 771,837

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 16/06/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1920
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/05/1949
     Withdrawn on 22/09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/05/1949
WDN   m/e 30/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 20
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 345    
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
22/09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 345    
16/06/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev