Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 91 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 6608 Week
» 6608 Month
» 73470 Year
» 1738846 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 80 m/e 12/1921
Great Western Railway 348 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 12/1921
Withdrawal Sat 05/05/1956
Service Life 34 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys
Total Mileage 711,206

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Fri 25/01/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1921
RHY   Rhymney 4w/e 10/07/1948
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/08/1948
     Withdrawn on 05/05/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/08/1948
WDN   m/e 31/05/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1921 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 80
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 348    
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY)    
07/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
05/05/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 348    
25/01/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev