Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 564 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3889 Week
» 3889 Month
» 70751 Year
» 1736127 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 90 m/e 12/1921
Great Western Railway 349 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 12/1921
Withdrawal Mon 04/03/1957
Service Life 35 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys
Total Mileage 674,489

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 13/07/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1921
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 21/04/1951
86C   Cardiff Canton 3w/e 19/05/1951
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/07/1954
88C   Barry 4w/e 01/01/1955
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 08/09/1956
     Withdrawn on 04/03/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 08/09/1956
WDN   m/e 31/03/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1921 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 90
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 349    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
08/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
04/03/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 349    
13/07/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev