Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 352 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18155 Week
» 71171 Month
» 190698 Year
» 3217551 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
122 |
m/e |
08/1915 |
Great Western Railway |
352 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
To Service |
During 08/1915 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/03/1955 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys |
Total Mileage |
859,405 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1915 |
THT |
|
Treherbert |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/03/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1915 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 122 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 352 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
14/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 352 |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|