Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 130 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 6647 Week
» 6647 Month
» 73509 Year
» 1738885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 125 m/e 07/1916
Great Western Railway 360 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 07/1916
Withdrawal Thu 10/02/1955
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys
Total Mileage 810,893

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 26/03/1955 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1916
RHY   Rhymney 4w/e 10/07/1948
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/08/1948
     Withdrawn on 10/02/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/08/1948
WDN   m/e 28/02/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1916 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 125
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 360    
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY)    
07/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
10/02/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 360    
26/03/1955 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev