Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 24 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4001 Week
» 15238 Month
» 248158 Year
» 1913534 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 127 m/e 07/1916
Great Western Railway 361 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 07/1916
Withdrawal Tue 29/01/1957
Service Life 40 yrs, 6 mths , 30 dys
Total Mileage 649,228
Information Mileage since rebuild in 1925

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 23/02/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1916
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 14/07/1956
     Withdrawn on 29/01/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 14/07/1956
WDN   m/e 31/01/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 General Further locomotives noted carrying the prefix 'W' with blank tanks or tender sides were:-Nos. 33, 216/63, 393, 1141, 1993, 2048, 5388, 5625, 6703, 7751/68, while those lettered 'British Railways' were:-Nos. 361, 3103, 4217, 4533, 5035/99, 5257, 5520, 5641/52/55 an 6964. Nos. 271, 4206 an 5958 had been prefixed, but still carried 'G.W.R.' SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1916 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 127
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 361    
14/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
29/01/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 361    
23/02/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    
06/1957 Report Report: A report that ex-Taff Vale 0-6-2 tank No. 361 had been installed at Newton Abbot as a stationary boiler is claimed as an error by another reader; the engine did in fact go to Newton Abbot, he writes, but for the reason that her boiler was to be transferred there to 2-6-2 tank No. 4547, which was in need of a new one. No. 4547, incidentally, is unusual in that it has never seen black livery ; it was still G.W. green when overhauled and is now in the new green livery. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957)    

prev prev