Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 173 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 1264 Week
» 8876 Month
» 75738 Year
» 1741114 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 128 m/e 07/1916
Great Western Railway 362 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 07/1916
Withdrawal Mon 28/05/1956
Service Life 39 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys
Total Mileage 514,584
Information Mileage figure since rebuild in 1926

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 14/07/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1916
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 24/01/1953
     Withdrawn on 28/05/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 24/01/1953
WDN   m/e 31/05/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1916 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 128
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 362    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
28/05/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 362    
14/07/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev