Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 181 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 1272 Week
» 8884 Month
» 75746 Year
» 1741122 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 130 m/e 07/1916
Great Western Railway 365 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 07/1916
Withdrawal Mon 17/10/1955
Service Life 39 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys
Total Mileage 760,950

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 24/03/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1916
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 16/07/1955
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 10/09/1955
     Withdrawn on 17/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 10/09/1955
WDN   m/e 31/10/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1916 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 130
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 365    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
17/10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 365    
24/03/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev