Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 124 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 124 Week
» 19025 Month
» 19025 Year
» 1684401 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 133 m/e 02/1919
Great Western Railway 367 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
To Service During 02/1919
Withdrawal Fri 23/03/1956 (Defective cylinder block)
Total Mileage 758,406
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 19/05/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 37 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1919
   Withdrawn on 23/03/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC THT Treherbert 4w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 27/12/1947
WDN   m/e 31/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1919 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 133
Built at Nasmyth Wilson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 367    
23/03/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 367    

prev prev