Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 99 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 6616 Week
» 6616 Month
» 73478 Year
» 1738854 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 134 m/e 05/1920
Great Western Railway 368 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 05/1920
Withdrawal Wed 24/10/1956
Service Life 36 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys
Total Mileage 730,291

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 01/12/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1920
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 25/02/1956
     Withdrawn on 24/10/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   m/e 31/10/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 134
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 368    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
24/10/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 368    
01/12/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev