Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 43 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4020 Week
» 15257 Month
» 248177 Year
» 1913553 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 136 m/e 03/1919
Great Western Railway 371 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
To Service During 03/1919
Withdrawal Tue 18/01/1955
Service Life 35 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys
Total Mileage 684,132

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 18/06/1955 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1919
RHY   Rhymney 4w/e 10/07/1948
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/08/1948
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/12/1951
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/01/1952
86J   Aberdare 4w/e 14/06/1952
86J   Aberdare 6w/e 30/06/1952
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/11/1952
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/07/1954
     Withdrawn on 18/01/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/07/1954
WDN   m/e 31/01/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1919 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 136
Built at Nasmyth Wilson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 371    
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY)    
07/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
18/01/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 371    
18/06/1955 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev