Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 54 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 54 Week
» 26675 Month
» 26675 Year
» 1692051 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 139 m/e 04/1919
Great Western Railway 373 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
To Service During 04/1919
Withdrawal Mon 26/08/1957
Total Mileage 810,350
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 17/05/1958 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 38 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1919
88E Abercynon 4w/e 06/10/1956
   Withdrawn on 26/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 06/10/1956
WDN   m/e 31/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1919 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 139
Built at Nasmyth Wilson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 373    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
26/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 373    

prev prev