Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 138 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 138 Week
» 19039 Month
» 19039 Year
» 1684415 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 144 m/e 05/1920
Great Western Railway 375 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 05/1920
Withdrawal Mon 22/11/1954
Total Mileage 736,160
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 16/07/1955 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 34 yrs, 6 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1920
88E Abercynon 6w/e 30/06/1951
88C Barry 4w/e 31/12/1951
   Withdrawn on 22/11/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 12/07/1947
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 09/08/1947
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 01/12/1951
WDN   m/e 30/11/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 144
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 375    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
31/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
22/11/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 375    

prev prev