Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 123 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 6640 Week
» 6640 Month
» 73502 Year
» 1738878 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 149 m/e 05/1920
Great Western Railway 376 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 05/1920
Withdrawal Mon 14/01/1957
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys
Total Mileage 755,546

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 07/09/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1920
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 25/11/1953
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 19/06/1954
88C   Barry 4w/e 01/01/1955
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 06/10/1956
     Withdrawn on 14/01/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 06/10/1956
WDN   m/e 31/01/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 149
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 376    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
14/01/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 376    
07/09/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev