Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 20 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 3997 Week
» 15234 Month
» 248154 Year
» 1913530 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 154 m/e 05/1919
Great Western Railway 377 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
To Service During 05/1919
Withdrawal Mon 14/05/1956
Service Life 37 yrs , 14 dys
Total Mileage 848,431

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 08/09/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1919
CHYS   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/05/1949
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 25/11/1953
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 09/10/1954
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 23/04/1955
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 28/01/1956
88C   Barry 4w/e 25/02/1956
     Withdrawn on 14/05/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/05/1949
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   m/e 31/05/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 154
Built at Nasmyth Wilson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 377    
21/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (CHYS)    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
14/05/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 377    
08/09/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev