Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 43 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4020 Week
» 15257 Month
» 248177 Year
» 1913553 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 156 m/e 05/1919
Great Western Railway 378 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
To Service During 05/1919
Withdrawal Mon 17/12/1956
Service Life 37 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys
Total Mileage 717,464

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 18/05/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1919
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 25/11/1953
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 22/05/1954
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 04/12/1954
88A   Cardiff Cathays 8w/e 26/03/1955
     Withdrawn on 17/12/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 26/02/1955
WDN   m/e 31/12/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 156
Built at Nasmyth Wilson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 378    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
17/12/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 378    
18/05/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev