Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 574 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18377 Week
» 71393 Month
» 190920 Year
» 3217773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
157 |
m/e |
05/1919 |
Great Western Railway |
379 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Nasmyth Wilson |
To Service |
During 05/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 27/02/1956 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys |
Total Mileage |
813,626 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
29/02/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 157 Built at Nasmyth Wilson |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 379 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
29/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
27/02/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 379 |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|