Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 31 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4008 Week
» 15245 Month
» 248165 Year
» 1913541 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 157 m/e 05/1919
Great Western Railway 379 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
To Service During 05/1919
Withdrawal Mon 27/02/1956
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys
Total Mileage 813,626

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 21/04/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1919
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 26/01/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/02/1952
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 03/10/1953
     Withdrawn on 27/02/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   m/e 29/02/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 157
Built at Nasmyth Wilson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 379    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
29/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
27/02/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 379    
21/04/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev