Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 46 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 46 Week
» 26667 Month
» 26667 Year
» 1692043 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 159 m/e 07/1919
Great Western Railway 381 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
To Service During 07/1919
Withdrawal Mon 26/08/1957
Total Mileage 630,157
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 02/11/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 38 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys
Information Mileage since rebuild in 1925

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1919
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/07/1954
88F Treherbert 4w/e 09/10/1954
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 16/07/1955
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/12/1955
88E Abercynon 8w/e 20/04/1957
   Withdrawn on 26/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   m/e 31/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 159
Built at Nasmyth Wilson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 381    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
26/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 381    

prev prev